THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/04/25 20:29:20 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 7734
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Queen's Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis St.
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J2
Phone: (647) 827-9200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Merle Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vojdani (CPSO#: 59070 ) Dr. O. Vojdani (CPSO#: 88245 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Division of Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4378
Business Address: Unit B
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3E9
(519) 888-6655

Corporation Name: O. Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Vojdani (CPSO#: 88245 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Extension: 7734
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Queen's Quay Medical
10 Lower Jarvis St.
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J2
Phone: (647) 827-9200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 29 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2007
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Merle Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vojdani (CPSO#: 59070 ) Dr. O. Vojdani (CPSO#: 88245 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Division of Oncology
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4378
Business Address: Unit B
158 University Avenue West
Waterloo Ontario N2L 3E9
(519) 888-6655

Corporation Name: O. Vojdani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Vojdani (CPSO#: 88245 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMID KYLE VOJDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOJDANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMID KYLE VOJDANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOJDANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Apr 2008