THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 08:50:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Anaesthesia
Kingston General Hospital Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Address: Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
PO Box 603
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Phone: 613-544-4900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wang Dietrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dietrich (CPSO#: 73663 ) Dr. L. Wang (CPSO#: 59429 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: 3113 Rutledge Road
PO Box 270
Sydenham Ontario K0H 2T0
(613) 376-3327
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Providence Care
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-1101

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Anaesthesia
Kingston General Hospital Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 548-7827
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Address: Providence Care Hospital
752 King Street West
PO Box 603
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
Phone: 613-544-4900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3310
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wang Dietrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dietrich (CPSO#: 73663 ) Dr. L. Wang (CPSO#: 59429 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: 3113 Rutledge Road
PO Box 270
Sydenham Ontario K0H 2T0
(613) 376-3327
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Providence Care
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-1101

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Jan 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUIE TI SIANG WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LOUIE TI SIANG WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988