THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:17:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3113 Rutledge Rd, P.O. Box 270
Sydenham Ontario K0H 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 376-3327
Fax: 1 888 932 7944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wang Dietrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dietrich (CPSO#: 73663 ) Dr. L. Wang (CPSO#: 59429 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: 3113 Rutledge Road
PO Box 270
Sydenham Ontario K0H 2T0
(613) 376-3327
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Providence Care
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-1101

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3113 Rutledge Rd, P.O. Box 270
Sydenham Ontario K0H 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 376-3327
Fax: 1 888 932 7944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2001
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wang Dietrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dietrich (CPSO#: 73663 ) Dr. L. Wang (CPSO#: 59429 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 549-6666
Business Address: 3113 Rutledge Road
PO Box 270
Sydenham Ontario K0H 2T0
(613) 376-3327
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 5G2
(613) 544-3310
Business Address: Providence Care
752 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 4X3
(613) 546-1101

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANETTE LOUISE DIETRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIETRICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEANETTE LOUISE DIETRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIETRICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1999