THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 18:23:44 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 254
1720 Howard Ave.
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-2230
Fax: (519) 258-5883

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lewis (CPSO#: 117959 ) Dr. J. Hurst (CPSO#: 59540 ) Dr. S. Lewis (CPSO#: 59558 )
Business Address: 254 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 258-2230
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 254
1720 Howard Ave.
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-2230
Fax: (519) 258-5883

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lewis (CPSO#: 117959 ) Dr. J. Hurst (CPSO#: 59540 ) Dr. S. Lewis (CPSO#: 59558 )
Business Address: 254 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 258-2230
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODY LYNN HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODY LYNN HURST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HURST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988