THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Building
1720 Howard Ave. Suite 254
Windsor, Ontario
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-2230
Fax: (519) 258-5883

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lewis (CPSO#: 117959 ) Dr. J. Hurst (CPSO#: 59540 ) Dr. S. Lewis (CPSO#: 59558 )
Business Address: 254 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 258-2230
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Building
1720 Howard Ave. Suite 254
Windsor, Ontario
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-2230
Fax: (519) 258-5883

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Lewis (CPSO#: 117959 ) Dr. J. Hurst (CPSO#: 59540 ) Dr. S. Lewis (CPSO#: 59558 )
Business Address: 254 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 258-2230
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELDON DANIEL LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHELDON DANIEL LEWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEWIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 12 Jun 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988