THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 740-1625
Fax: (519) 740-0115
Address: Tri-city Colonsocopy
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Suite 200
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: (519) 650-5577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolyn Klahsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Klahsen (CPSO#: 63657 ) Dr. D. Kolyn (CPSO#: 59578 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2333
Business Address: Tri-City Colonoscopy
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
(519) 650-2777
Business Address: Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
(519) 740-1625

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 740-1625
Fax: (519) 740-0115
Address: Tri-city Colonsocopy
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Suite 200
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: (519) 650-5577

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolyn Klahsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Klahsen (CPSO#: 63657 ) Dr. D. Kolyn (CPSO#: 59578 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2333
Business Address: Tri-City Colonoscopy
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
(519) 650-2777
Business Address: Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
(519) 740-1625

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA MARIE KOLYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLYN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONNA MARIE KOLYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLYN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 23, 2016, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, London, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Kolyn in respect of an incident that took place in December 2009.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On December 23, 2016, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, London, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Kolyn in respect of an incident that took place in December 2009.

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988