THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:34:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Suite 200
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolyn Klahsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Klahsen (CPSO#: 63657 ) Dr. D. Kolyn (CPSO#: 59578 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2333
Business Address: Tri-City Colonoscopy
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
(519) 650-2777
Business Address: Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
(519) 740-1625

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 621-2333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Suite 200
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kolyn Klahsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Klahsen (CPSO#: 63657 ) Dr. D. Kolyn (CPSO#: 59578 )
Business Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
(519) 621-2333
Business Address: Tri-City Colonoscopy
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener Ontario N2P 0A4
(519) 650-2777
Business Address: Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Ontario N1R 7J9
(519) 740-1625

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES KLAHSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAHSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES KLAHSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLAHSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991