THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:14:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Melita Crescent
Toronto Ontario M6G 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-1330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 Melita Crescent
Suite 232
Toronto Ontario M6G 3Z4
Phone: 416-530-1330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8 The Donway East
Toronto Ontario M3C 3R7
Phone: 416-445-8037
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussman (CPSO#: 59684 ) Dr. B. Strauss (CPSO#: 65556 )
Business Address: 301 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
(905) 475-3121
Business Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 402
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 466-4290

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Melita Crescent
Toronto Ontario M6G 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-530-1330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600 Melita Crescent
Suite 232
Toronto Ontario M6G 3Z4
Phone: 416-530-1330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 8 The Donway East
Toronto Ontario M3C 3R7
Phone: 416-445-8037
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussman (CPSO#: 59684 ) Dr. B. Strauss (CPSO#: 65556 )
Business Address: 301 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
(905) 475-3121
Business Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 402
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 466-4290

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRIAM RUTH HUSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRIAM RUTH HUSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988