THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:12:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Unionville Gate
Suite 301
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 475-3121
Fax: (905) 475-4270
Address: 4300 hwy 7
Markham Ontario L3R0W7
Phone: 9054772822
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussman (CPSO#: 59684 ) Dr. B. Strauss (CPSO#: 65556 )
Business Address: 301 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
(905) 475-3121
Business Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 402
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 466-4290

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Unionville Gate
Suite 301
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 475-3121
Fax: (905) 475-4270
Address: 4300 hwy 7
Markham Ontario L3R0W7
Phone: 9054772822
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hussman (CPSO#: 59684 ) Dr. B. Strauss (CPSO#: 65556 )
Business Address: 301 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham Ontario L3R 0W7
(905) 475-3121
Business Address: 235 Danforth Avenue
Suite 402
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 466-4290

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY IRWIN STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BARRY IRWIN STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992