THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:50:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, SPANISH, YIDDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Queensway E
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)-897-0788
Fax: (905)-897-9229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Isenberg (CPSO#: 60031 ) Dr. R. Libman (CPSO#: 25680 )
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-9228

Corporation Name: Isenberg Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HEBREW, SPANISH, YIDDISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 21 Queensway E
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)-897-0788
Fax: (905)-897-9229

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Isenberg (CPSO#: 60031 ) Dr. R. Libman (CPSO#: 25680 )
Business Address: 21 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B6
(905) 897-9228

Corporation Name: Isenberg Shapiro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Apr 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
20 Mar 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 20 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 20, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joel Harold
Isenberg, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Isenberg
to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. JOEL HAROLD ISENBERG
("Dr. Isenberg")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public;

"QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.

(2) I, Dr. Isenberg, certificate of registration number 60031, am a member of
the College.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) I, Dr. Isenberg, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
Undertaking, effective immediately.

Practice Restriction

(4) I, Dr. Isenberg, undertake that I will cease to prescribe methadone,
effective May 15, 2019, in any jurisdiction.

(1) I, Dr. Isenberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of
executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform
the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
commencing practice at that location.

(5) I, Dr. Isenberg, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a
College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
the provisions of this Undertaking.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(6) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(7) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(9) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that the College will provide this
Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
of Staff").

(10) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(11) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(12) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Isenberg has ceased to prescribe methadone, effective May
15, 2019, in any jurisdiction.

D. CONSENT

(13) I, Dr. Isenberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(14) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this
Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Isenberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
all Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of
my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Isenberg, give my irrevocable consent to any Chief of Staff to
disclose to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to
this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 20, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Joel Harold
Isenberg, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Isenberg
to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. JOEL HAROLD ISENBERG
("Dr. Isenberg")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________________________________________

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public;

"QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.

(2) I, Dr. Isenberg, certificate of registration number 60031, am a member of
the College.

B. UNDERTAKING

(3) I, Dr. Isenberg, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
Undertaking, effective immediately.

Practice Restriction

(4) I, Dr. Isenberg, undertake that I will cease to prescribe methadone,
effective May 15, 2019, in any jurisdiction.

(1) I, Dr. Isenberg, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited
to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health
Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively
my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of
executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform
the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
commencing practice at that location.

(5) I, Dr. Isenberg, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with,
unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a
College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with
the provisions of this Undertaking.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

(6) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(7) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
Undertaking.

(8) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
right to do so.

(9) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that the College will provide this
Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
of Staff").

(10) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following:
consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further
action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(11) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(12) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
being posted in accordance with section (12)(a) above, the
following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Isenberg has ceased to prescribe methadone, effective May
15, 2019, in any jurisdiction.

D. CONSENT

(13) I, Dr. Isenberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(14) I, Dr. Isenberg, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
attached hereto as Appendix "A" and that the consent forms part of this
Undertaking.

(15) I, Dr. Isenberg, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
all Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of
my compliance with this Undertaking.

(16) I, Dr. Isenberg, give my irrevocable consent to any Chief of Staff to
disclose to the College, and to one another, all information relevant to
this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 20 Mar 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 20, 2019:

- Dr. Isenberg has ceased to prescribe methadone, effective May 15, 2019, in any jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 20 Mar 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Joel Harold Isenberg to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 20, 2019:

- Dr. Isenberg has ceased to prescribe methadone, effective May 15, 2019, in any jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1988