THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery, #1504
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6426
Fax: (416) 813-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 12 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tara M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams (CPSO#: 63741 ) Dr. P. Dirks (CPSO#: 60703 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6010

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter B. Dirks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams (CPSO#: 63741 ) Dr. P. Dirks (CPSO#: 60703 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6426

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery, #1504
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6426
Fax: (416) 813-4975

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 12 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tara M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams (CPSO#: 63741 ) Dr. P. Dirks (CPSO#: 60703 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6010

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter B. Dirks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams (CPSO#: 63741 ) Dr. P. Dirks (CPSO#: 60703 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6426

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER BENJAMIN DIRKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRKS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER BENJAMIN DIRKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIRKS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989