THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:16:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6486
Extension: 6010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tara M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams (CPSO#: 63741 ) Dr. P. Dirks (CPSO#: 60703 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6010

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter B. Dirks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams (CPSO#: 63741 ) Dr. P. Dirks (CPSO#: 60703 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6426

Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jan 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 530-6486
Extension: 6010
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tara M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams (CPSO#: 63741 ) Dr. P. Dirks (CPSO#: 60703 )
Business Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6010

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter B. Dirks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams (CPSO#: 63741 ) Dr. P. Dirks (CPSO#: 60703 )
Business Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
(416) 813-6426

Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jan 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA MARGARET WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA MARGARET WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991