THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:44:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
170 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7777
Fax: (905) 919-1698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pope (CPSO#: 67701 ) Dr. M. Pope (CPSO#: 60898 )
Business Address: Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-7777
Business Address: 201-170 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 3A8
9058487777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 201
170 Queensway W
Mississauga Ontario L5B 3A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 848-7777
Fax: (905) 919-1698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pope (CPSO#: 67701 ) Dr. M. Pope (CPSO#: 60898 )
Business Address: Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-7777
Business Address: 201-170 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 3A8
9058487777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989