THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:32:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6883
Fax: (416) 813-7909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pope (CPSO#: 67701 ) Dr. M. Pope (CPSO#: 60898 )
Business Address: Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-7777
Business Address: 201-170 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 3A8
9058487777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6883
Fax: (416) 813-7909

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 02 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Pope Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pope (CPSO#: 67701 ) Dr. M. Pope (CPSO#: 60898 )
Business Address: Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-7777
Business Address: 201-170 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 3A8
9058487777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELENA POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELENA POPE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy, Bucharest, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 May 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1994
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 1999

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 May 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 1994