THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 14:16:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomsen (CPSO#: 60875 ) Dr. P. Thomsen (CPSO#: 60957 )
Business Address: Suite B - 274 Lyden Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 6B8
(519) 758-8626

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Thomsen (CPSO#: 60875 ) Dr. P. Thomsen (CPSO#: 60957 )
Business Address: Suite B - 274 Lyden Road
Brantford Ontario N3R 6B8
(519) 758-8626

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA CHRISTINE THOMSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICIA CHRISTINE THOMSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989