THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 480
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 339-0707
Fax: 2897152210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GINTY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ginty (CPSO#: 61000 ) Dr. A. Ginty (CPSO#: 62570 )
Business Address: 480-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
9053390707
Business Address: 104-465 Morden Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3W6
9058427154

Corporation Name: Ginty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 480
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 339-0707
Fax: 2897152210

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GINTY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ginty (CPSO#: 61000 ) Dr. A. Ginty (CPSO#: 62570 )
Business Address: 480-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
9053390707
Business Address: 104-465 Morden Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3W6
9058427154

Corporation Name: Ginty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ROBERT GINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ROBERT GINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989