THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 18:14:28 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Restore-Me Clinic
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-609-7465
Fax: 1-866-483-1786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GINTY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ginty (CPSO#: 61000 ) Dr. A. Ginty (CPSO#: 62570 )
Business Address: 480-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
9053390707
Business Address: 104-465 Morden Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3W6
9058427154

Corporation Name: Ginty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Restore-Me Clinic
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-609-7465
Fax: 1-866-483-1786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: GINTY MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ginty (CPSO#: 61000 ) Dr. A. Ginty (CPSO#: 62570 )
Business Address: 480-2525 Old Bronte Rd
Oakville ON L6M 4J2
9053390707
Business Address: 104-465 Morden Rd
Oakville ON L6K 3W6
9058427154

Corporation Name: Ginty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA CLARE GINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA CLARE GINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GINTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990