THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 12:17:00 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3680
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Samson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Creery (CPSO#: 61008 ) Dr. L. Samson (CPSO#: 62549 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2606

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 3680
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Samson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Creery (CPSO#: 61008 ) Dr. L. Samson (CPSO#: 62549 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2606

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER DAVID CREERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CREERY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER DAVID CREERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CREERY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989