THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:57:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2243
Fax: (613) 738-4866
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137377600
Extension: 2243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 05 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Samson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Creery (CPSO#: 61008 ) Dr. L. Samson (CPSO#: 62549 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2606

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Extension: 2243
Fax: (613) 738-4866
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137377600
Extension: 2243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 05 Sep 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Samson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Creery (CPSO#: 61008 ) Dr. L. Samson (CPSO#: 62549 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2606

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDY MICHELLE SAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LINDY MICHELLE SAMSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1990