THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 195 County Court Blvd
Suite 100
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-799-1850
Extension: 221
Fax: 905-799-8040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Nalin and Vandana Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 61100 ) Dr. N. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 62854 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6J 3J1
(905) 799-1850
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 747-3500
Business Address: 510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
(905) 707-5007
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 100-195 County Court Blvd
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
9057991850 Extn: 221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 195 County Court Blvd
Suite 100
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-799-1850
Extension: 221
Fax: 905-799-8040

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 19 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 May 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Nalin and Vandana Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 61100 ) Dr. N. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 62854 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6J 3J1
(905) 799-1850
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 747-3500
Business Address: 510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
(905) 707-5007
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 100-195 County Court Blvd
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
9057991850 Extn: 221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANDANA AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VANDANA AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989