THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:38:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 845 2571
Extension: 4155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 330 HWY #7 East
Unit 510
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B3P8
Phone: 905-707-5008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242 1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Nalin and Vandana Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 61100 ) Dr. N. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 62854 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6J 3J1
(905) 799-1850
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 747-3500
Business Address: 510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
(905) 707-5007
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 100-195 County Court Blvd
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
9057991850 Extn: 221

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 845 2571
Extension: 4155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 330 HWY #7 East
Unit 510
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B3P8
Phone: 905-707-5008
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Phone: 416 242 1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Nalin and Vandana Ahluwalia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 61100 ) Dr. N. Ahluwalia (CPSO#: 62854 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571
Business Address: Suite 314
40 Finchgate Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6J 3J1
(905) 799-1850
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(416) 747-3500
Business Address: 510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 3P8
(905) 707-5007
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000
Business Address: 100-195 County Court Blvd
Brampton ON L6W 4P7
9057991850 Extn: 221

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NALIN KUMAR AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NALIN KUMAR AHLUWALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHLUWALIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1990