THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 08:07:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Suite 210
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-1066
Fax: (705) 876-8763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webster Auyeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Auyeung (CPSO#: 61290 ) Dr. J. Webster (CPSO#: 62215 )
Business Address: PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Alexander Medical Building
210 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
(705) 876-1066

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Suite 210
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-1066
Fax: (705) 876-8763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webster Auyeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Auyeung (CPSO#: 61290 ) Dr. J. Webster (CPSO#: 62215 )
Business Address: PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Alexander Medical Building
210 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
(705) 876-1066

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRACE CHE YAN AUYEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUYEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRACE CHE YAN AUYEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUYEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989