THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:17:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Suite 210
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-876-1066
Fax: 705-876-8763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webster Auyeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Auyeung (CPSO#: 61290 ) Dr. J. Webster (CPSO#: 62215 )
Business Address: PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Alexander Medical Building
210 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
(705) 876-1066

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Alexander Medical Building
849 Alexander Court
Suite 210
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-876-1066
Fax: 705-876-8763

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Webster Auyeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Auyeung (CPSO#: 61290 ) Dr. J. Webster (CPSO#: 62215 )
Business Address: PRHC - 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
(705) 743-2121
Business Address: Alexander Medical Building
210 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
(705) 876-1066

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES WEBSTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEBSTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990