THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:46:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Shriners Hospitals for Children
Honolulu
1310 Punahou Street
Honolulu Hawaii 96826
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 808-951-3640
Fax: 808-951-3718
Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Department of Surgery
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Fiji
Saipan
USA - Guam
USA - Hawaii

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOROZ-SCHNURR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moroz (CPSO#: 61293 ) Dr. C. Schnurr (CPSO#: 63680 )
Business Address: 111 Shore Rd
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
5193755137

Corporation Name: Moroz-Schnurr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Shriners Hospitals for Children
Honolulu
1310 Punahou Street
Honolulu Hawaii 96826
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 808-951-3640
Fax: 808-951-3718
Address: 1800 8th St E
Brightshores Health System
Department of Surgery
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut
Fiji
Saipan
USA - Guam
USA - Hawaii

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOROZ-SCHNURR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moroz (CPSO#: 61293 ) Dr. C. Schnurr (CPSO#: 63680 )
Business Address: 111 Shore Rd
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
5193755137

Corporation Name: Moroz-Schnurr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JOHN MOROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOROZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JOHN MOROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOROZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989