THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 08:55:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 340 High Street
Bright Shores Health System-southampton
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-797-33230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOROZ-SCHNURR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moroz (CPSO#: 61293 ) Dr. C. Schnurr (CPSO#: 63680 )
Business Address: 111 Shore Rd
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
5193755137

Corporation Name: Moroz-Schnurr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 340 High Street
Bright Shores Health System-southampton
Southampton Ontario N0H 2L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-797-33230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jul 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Hawaii

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MOROZ-SCHNURR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Moroz (CPSO#: 61293 ) Dr. C. Schnurr (CPSO#: 63680 )
Business Address: 111 Shore Rd
Southampton ON N0H 2L0
5193755137

Corporation Name: Moroz-Schnurr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLARE MARIE SCHNURR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNURR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLARE MARIE SCHNURR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHNURR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1991