THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:20:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10239
Fax: (613) 761-5487

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rostom Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dube (CPSO#: 61402 ) Dr. A. Rostom (CPSO#: 65112 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
A1 Endoscopy Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4221
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

Corporation Name: Catherine Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10239
Fax: (613) 761-5487

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 20 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 15 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rostom Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dube (CPSO#: 61402 ) Dr. A. Rostom (CPSO#: 65112 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
A1 Endoscopy Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4221
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

Corporation Name: Catherine Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 May 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE DUBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 May 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989