THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:34:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
A1 Endoscopy Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10215
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Oct 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rostom Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dube (CPSO#: 61402 ) Dr. A. Rostom (CPSO#: 65112 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
A1 Endoscopy Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4221
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
A1 Endoscopy Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Extension: 10215
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 01 Oct 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rostom Dube Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dube (CPSO#: 61402 ) Dr. A. Rostom (CPSO#: 65112 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
A1 Endoscopy Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 761-4221
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAA MOSTAFA KAMEL AHMED ROSTOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSTOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAA MOSTAFA KAMEL AHMED ROSTOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSTOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992