THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:19:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 74729
Fax: (613) 739-6807

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 15 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wolfish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wolfish (CPSO#: 62475 ) Dr. S. Aaron (CPSO#: 62311 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
1812F - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 739-6636
Business Address: 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: Health Services
University of Ottawa
Suite 200
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A2
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata Ontario K2M 2G9
(613) 599-3321

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 74729
Fax: (613) 739-6807

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 15 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wolfish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wolfish (CPSO#: 62475 ) Dr. S. Aaron (CPSO#: 62311 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
1812F - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 739-6636
Business Address: 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: Health Services
University of Ottawa
Suite 200
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A2
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata Ontario K2M 2G9
(613) 599-3321

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAWN DAVID AARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AARON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAWN DAVID AARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AARON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990