THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:20:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Marie Curie Private
Suite 200
Ottawa Ontario K1N 9N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Michael Cowpland Dr.
Kanata Ontario K2M 1W8
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wolfish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wolfish (CPSO#: 62475 ) Dr. S. Aaron (CPSO#: 62311 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
1812F - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 739-6636
Business Address: 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: Health Services
University of Ottawa
Suite 200
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A2
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata Ontario K2M 2G9
(613) 599-3321

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Marie Curie Private
Suite 200
Ottawa Ontario K1N 9N3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 80 Michael Cowpland Dr.
Kanata Ontario K2M 1W8
Phone: (613) 599-3321
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wolfish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wolfish (CPSO#: 62475 ) Dr. S. Aaron (CPSO#: 62311 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
1812F - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 739-6636
Business Address: 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
Business Address: Health Services
University of Ottawa
Suite 200
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa Ontario K1N 1A2
Business Address: 80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata Ontario K2M 2G9
(613) 599-3321

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN REVA WOLFISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFISH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN REVA WOLFISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLFISH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990