THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 07:04:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-1332
Fax: (519) 578-1399
Address: Dynacare
115 Midair Court
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
Phone: (905) 790-3000
Fax: (905) 790-9659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esiahas Amdemichael, Dr. Ana Nikolic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Amdemichael (CPSO#: 62458 ) Dr. A. Nikolic (CPSO#: 69192 )
Business Address: Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P2
(519) 578-1332

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-1332
Fax: (519) 578-1399
Address: Dynacare
115 Midair Court
Brampton Ontario L6T 5M3
Phone: (905) 790-3000
Fax: (905) 790-9659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esiahas Amdemichael, Dr. Ana Nikolic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Amdemichael (CPSO#: 62458 ) Dr. A. Nikolic (CPSO#: 69192 )
Business Address: Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P2
(519) 578-1332

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESIAHAS AMDEMICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMDEMICHAEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESIAHAS AMDEMICHAEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMDEMICHAEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990