THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 11:46:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-1332
Fax: (519) 578-1399

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esiahas Amdemichael, Dr. Ana Nikolic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Amdemichael (CPSO#: 62458 ) Dr. A. Nikolic (CPSO#: 69192 )
Business Address: Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P2
(519) 578-1332

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 578-1332
Fax: (519) 578-1399

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esiahas Amdemichael, Dr. Ana Nikolic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Amdemichael (CPSO#: 62458 ) Dr. A. Nikolic (CPSO#: 69192 )
Business Address: Suite 26
385 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P2
(519) 578-1332

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA NIKOLIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKOLIC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANA NIKOLIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKOLIC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995