THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
C1-04
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5112
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Sharir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharir (CPSO#: 69232 ) Dr. A. Smith (CPSO#: 62493 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
C1-04
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-5112
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Sharir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharir (CPSO#: 69232 ) Dr. A. Smith (CPSO#: 62493 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Sep 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990