THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:14:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 25 Oct 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Sharir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharir (CPSO#: 69232 ) Dr. A. Smith (CPSO#: 62493 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-242-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 25 Oct 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Sharir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sharir (CPSO#: 69232 ) Dr. A. Smith (CPSO#: 62493 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON SHARIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHARON SHARIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHARIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995