THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 06:10:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
Medical Clinic
700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Extension: 5475
Fax: (905) 430-4013
Address: CMHA
60 Bond St. W.
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1A5
Phone: (905) 436-9945
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Drury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Drury (CPSO#: 69381 ) Dr. D. McNeill (CPSO#: 62691 )
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Address: CMHA
60 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1A5
Business Address: McKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Ontario Shores
700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Address: Brooklin Medical Centre
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin Ontario L1M 2E9
(905) 655-3321
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hsopital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental
Health Sciences
Medical Clinic
700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-5881
Extension: 5475
Fax: (905) 430-4013
Address: CMHA
60 Bond St. W.
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1A5
Phone: (905) 436-9945
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
HOSPITAL: Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences
LOCATION: Whitby

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Drury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Drury (CPSO#: 69381 ) Dr. D. McNeill (CPSO#: 62691 )
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Address: CMHA
60 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1A5
Business Address: McKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Ontario Shores
700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Address: Brooklin Medical Centre
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin Ontario L1M 2E9
(905) 655-3321
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hsopital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GREGORY MCNEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID GREGORY MCNEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNEILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990