THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:13:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Buggey Lane
Ajax Ontario L1Z 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054043112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave. S.
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton Ontario K0M 1S0
Phone: 7054571392
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Angeline St N
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: 705-324-6111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CMHA
60 Bond St. W
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1A5
Phone: (905) 436-9945
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Gordon St.
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
North York General Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Drury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Drury (CPSO#: 69381 ) Dr. D. McNeill (CPSO#: 62691 )
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Address: CMHA
60 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1A5
Business Address: McKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Ontario Shores
700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Address: Brooklin Medical Centre
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin Ontario L1M 2E9
(905) 655-3321
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hsopital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 56 Buggey Lane
Ajax Ontario L1Z 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054043112
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave. S.
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: 905-683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton Ontario K0M 1S0
Phone: 7054571392
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Angeline St N
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: 705-324-6111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Ct
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Phone: 905-576-8711
Fax: No Information Available
Address: CMHA
60 Bond St. W
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1A5
Phone: (905) 436-9945
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-743-2121
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 700 Gordon St.
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
North York General Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathryn Drury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Drury (CPSO#: 69381 ) Dr. D. McNeill (CPSO#: 62691 )
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angelina Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Business Address: CMHA
60 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1G 1A5
Business Address: McKenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: Ontario Shores
700 Gordon Street
Whitby Ontario L1N 5S9
Business Address: Brooklin Medical Centre
5959 Anderson Street
Brooklin Ontario L1M 2E9
(905) 655-3321
Business Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hsopital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN JEANETTE DRURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRURY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN JEANETTE DRURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRURY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995