THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 11:39:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-21 Surrey St W
Surrey Street Medical Building
Immigration Medical Examiners Guelph
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2264860471
Fax: 2264860472
Address: 50 Stone Rd E
University of Guelph
JT Powel Building
Student Health
Guelph ON N1G 2W1
Phone: 5198244120
Extension: 52131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 39-50 Stone Rd E
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
JT Powell Building
Guelph ON N1G 2W2
Phone: 5198244120
Extension: 52131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bakker & Casale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bakker (CPSO#: 62695 ) Dr. M. Casale (CPSO#: 72738 )
Business Address: 303-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
226-486-0471

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-21 Surrey St W
Surrey Street Medical Building
Immigration Medical Examiners Guelph
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2264860471
Fax: 2264860472
Address: 50 Stone Rd E
University of Guelph
JT Powel Building
Student Health
Guelph ON N1G 2W1
Phone: 5198244120
Extension: 52131
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 39-50 Stone Rd E
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
JT Powell Building
Guelph ON N1G 2W2
Phone: 5198244120
Extension: 52131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bakker & Casale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bakker (CPSO#: 62695 ) Dr. M. Casale (CPSO#: 72738 )
Business Address: 303-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
226-486-0471

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTHY JANE BAKKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOROTHY JANE BAKKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990