THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:53:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 486 0471
Fax: 226 486 0472

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bakker & Casale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bakker (CPSO#: 62695 ) Dr. M. Casale (CPSO#: 72738 )
Business Address: 303-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
226-486-0471

Corporation Name: Maria Casale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 486 0471
Fax: 226 486 0472

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bakker & Casale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bakker (CPSO#: 62695 ) Dr. M. Casale (CPSO#: 72738 )
Business Address: 303-21 Surrey St W
Guelph ON N1H 3R3
226-486-0471

Corporation Name: Maria Casale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CASALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASALE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIA CASALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASALE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1998