THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:55:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 523-1444
Fax: (905) 523-6600

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayer Choong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mayer (CPSO#: 63219 ) Dr. K. Choong (CPSO#: 66927 )
Business Address: The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2R3
(905) 523-1444
Business Address: McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room HSC-3A78
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 523-1444
Fax: (905) 523-6600

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayer Choong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mayer (CPSO#: 63219 ) Dr. K. Choong (CPSO#: 66927 )
Business Address: The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2R3
(905) 523-1444
Business Address: McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room HSC-3A78
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PERRY VINCENT MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PERRY VINCENT MAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAYER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 May 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Apr 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1990
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 1998

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 May 1996
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 May 1996

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 1996

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 1993
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 1993

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 1990