THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:10:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MALAY

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Room HSC-3E20
1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76651
Fax: 9055708973

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayer Choong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mayer (CPSO#: 63219 ) Dr. K. Choong (CPSO#: 66927 )
Business Address: The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2R3
(905) 523-1444
Business Address: McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room HSC-3A78
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MALAY
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Room HSC-3E20
1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76651
Fax: 9055708973

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayer Choong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mayer (CPSO#: 63219 ) Dr. K. Choong (CPSO#: 66927 )
Business Address: The Mayer Institute
20 Railway Street
Hamilton Ontario L8R 2R3
(905) 523-1444
Business Address: McMaster Childrens Hospital
Room HSC-3A78
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LI MEI CHOONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN LI MEI CHOONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993