THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 13:55:07 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FILIPINO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
8 M P 327
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5949
Fax: (416) 603-6204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Herbert Y. Gaisano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gan-Gaisano (CPSO#: 63318 ) Dr. H. Gaisano (CPSO#: 63315 ) Dr. G. Gaisano (CPSO#: 100966 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 8MP-327
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5949

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FILIPINO
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
8 M P 327
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5949
Fax: (416) 603-6204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 20 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Herbert Y. Gaisano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gan-Gaisano (CPSO#: 63318 ) Dr. H. Gaisano (CPSO#: 63315 ) Dr. G. Gaisano (CPSO#: 100966 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 8MP-327
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5949

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERBERT YOUNG GAISANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAISANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HERBERT YOUNG GAISANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAISANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1991
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 1991