THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 14:12:36 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FUKIEN, MANDARIN, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Herbert Y. Gaisano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gan-Gaisano (CPSO#: 63318 ) Dr. H. Gaisano (CPSO#: 63315 ) Dr. G. Gaisano (CPSO#: 100966 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 8MP-327
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5949

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, FUKIEN, MANDARIN, TAGALOG
Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 22 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Herbert Y. Gaisano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gan-Gaisano (CPSO#: 63318 ) Dr. H. Gaisano (CPSO#: 63315 ) Dr. G. Gaisano (CPSO#: 100966 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 8MP-327
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5949

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Philippines, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Feb 2024
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1991
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2024

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 1991