THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:58:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848 7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jivanji-Taher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Taher (CPSO#: 64606 ) Dr. N. Jivanji (CPSO#: 79843 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
200-150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4196
Business Address: 106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1I2
(905) 275-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 848 7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jivanji-Taher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Taher (CPSO#: 64606 ) Dr. N. Jivanji (CPSO#: 79843 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
200-150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4196
Business Address: 106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1I2
(905) 275-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAKHRUDDIN TAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAKHRUDDIN TAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 1991
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Aug 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1993

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 1991