THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 16:43:08 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7-1575 Jane St
North York ON M9N 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-243-2273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 County Court Blvd
medrose pharmacy and medical centre
Unit C
Brampton ON L6W 4K7
Phone: 905 451 9119
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jivanji-Taher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Taher (CPSO#: 64606 ) Dr. N. Jivanji (CPSO#: 79843 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
200-150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4196
Business Address: 106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1I2
(905) 275-2273

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7-1575 Jane St
North York ON M9N 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-243-2273
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 County Court Blvd
medrose pharmacy and medical centre
Unit C
Brampton ON L6W 4K7
Phone: 905 451 9119
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2005
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2005
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jivanji-Taher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jul 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Taher (CPSO#: 64606 ) Dr. N. Jivanji (CPSO#: 79843 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
200-150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A5
(416) 521-4196
Business Address: 106-250 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1I2
(905) 275-2273

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISSREEN JIVANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIVANJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NISSREEN JIVANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIVANJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2005

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2003