THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 09:00:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 436 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 438-5551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Postnatal Wellness centre
130 Thompson Road, London, Ontario
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
Phone: 519 601-8621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MLHU STI clinic
355 Wellington St, London, ON N6A 3
London Ontario N6A3N7
Phone: 5196636317
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doucette Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gray (CPSO#: 64975 ) Dr. J. Doucette (CPSO#: 64971 )
Business Address: Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 436 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
(519) 438-5551

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 436 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 438-5551
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Postnatal Wellness centre
130 Thompson Road, London, Ontario
London Ontario N5Z 2Y6
Phone: 519 601-8621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: MLHU STI clinic
355 Wellington St, London, ON N6A 3
London Ontario N6A3N7
Phone: 5196636317
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doucette Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gray (CPSO#: 64975 ) Dr. J. Doucette (CPSO#: 64971 )
Business Address: Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 436 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
(519) 438-5551

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELYN MARRIOTT DOUCETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUCETTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACQUELYN MARRIOTT DOUCETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUCETTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992