THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-667-6583
Fax: 519-667-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doucette Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gray (CPSO#: 64975 ) Dr. J. Doucette (CPSO#: 64971 )
Business Address: Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 436 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
(519) 438-5551

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-667-6583
Fax: 519-667-6546

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doucette Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Gray (CPSO#: 64975 ) Dr. J. Doucette (CPSO#: 64971 )
Business Address: Room E2-217
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Address: 436 Waterloo Street
London Ontario N6B 2P2
(519) 438-5551

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYL KENNETH GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARYL KENNETH GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992