THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:07:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 677 Great Northern Road
Unit #1
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 942-5151
Fax: (705) 942-7421

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amimi Bariciak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amimi (CPSO#: 65064 ) Dr. M. Bariciak (CPSO#: 65066 )
Business Address: Suite 1
677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
(705) 949-5182

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 677 Great Northern Road
Unit #1
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 942-5151
Fax: (705) 942-7421

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amimi Bariciak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amimi (CPSO#: 65064 ) Dr. M. Bariciak (CPSO#: 65066 )
Business Address: Suite 1
677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
(705) 949-5182

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYRIAM NADIA AMIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIMI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYRIAM NADIA AMIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIMI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992