THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:24:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 949-5182
Fax: (705) 251-9969

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amimi Bariciak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amimi (CPSO#: 65064 ) Dr. M. Bariciak (CPSO#: 65066 )
Business Address: Suite 1
677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
(705) 949-5182

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 949-5182
Fax: (705) 251-9969

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amimi Bariciak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amimi (CPSO#: 65064 ) Dr. M. Bariciak (CPSO#: 65066 )
Business Address: Suite 1
677 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 5A1
(705) 949-5182

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID BARICIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARICIAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK DAVID BARICIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARICIAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992