THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 09:25:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
M D C L Room 3204
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 21523
Fax: (905) 528-2814
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 40320
Fax: 9055282814

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Sergeant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant (CPSO#: 66607 ) Dr. S. Anand (CPSO#: 65167 )
Business Address: St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837 Extn: 12311
Business Address: Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 2B8
(905) 528-8969

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia S. Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant (CPSO#: 66607 ) Dr. S. Anand (CPSO#: 65167 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
MDCL Room 3204
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
M D C L Room 3204
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 21523
Fax: (905) 528-2814
Address: Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322
Extension: 40320
Fax: 9055282814

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Sergeant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant (CPSO#: 66607 ) Dr. S. Anand (CPSO#: 65167 )
Business Address: St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837 Extn: 12311
Business Address: Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 2B8
(905) 528-8969

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia S. Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant (CPSO#: 66607 ) Dr. S. Anand (CPSO#: 65167 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
MDCL Room 3204
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA SAVITRI ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SONIA SAVITRI ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992