THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:36:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 2B8
Phone: (905) 528-8969
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Engineering, Professional Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Engineering, Professional
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Sergeant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant (CPSO#: 66607 ) Dr. S. Anand (CPSO#: 65167 )
Business Address: St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837 Extn: 12311
Business Address: Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 2B8
(905) 528-8969

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia S. Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant (CPSO#: 66607 ) Dr. S. Anand (CPSO#: 65167 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
MDCL Room 3204
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 777-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 2B8
Phone: (905) 528-8969
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1995
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Engineering, Professional Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Engineering, Professional
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation St. Peter's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Sergeant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant (CPSO#: 66607 ) Dr. S. Anand (CPSO#: 65167 )
Business Address: St. Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1W9
(905) 777-3837 Extn: 12311
Business Address: Wayside House
15 Charlton Avenue West
Hamilton Ontario L8P 2B8
(905) 528-8969

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonia S. Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Sergeant (CPSO#: 66607 ) Dr. S. Anand (CPSO#: 65167 )
Business Address: McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
MDCL Room 3204
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYLES DAVID SERGEANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERGEANT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MYLES DAVID SERGEANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SERGEANT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1993