THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:47:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 516-4111
Fax: (416) 516-1104
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
C/O NICU, 1st Flr, OLM Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6067
Fax: 416 530 6505
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6611
Fax: (416) 530-6482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Chisamore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Offman (CPSO#: 65524 ) Dr. B. Chisamore (CPSO#: 65361 )
Business Address: Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(416) 516-4111
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
NICU, 1st Floor, OLM Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6067

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 516-4111
Fax: (416) 516-1104
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
C/O NICU, 1st Flr, OLM Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6067
Fax: 416 530 6505
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6611
Fax: (416) 530-6482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Chisamore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Offman (CPSO#: 65524 ) Dr. B. Chisamore (CPSO#: 65361 )
Business Address: Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
(416) 516-4111
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
NICU, 1st Floor, OLM Wing
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6067

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN CARMAN CHISAMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHISAMORE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN CARMAN CHISAMORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHISAMORE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992